MN SF2173 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Author added Latz
Pending: Senate Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Author added Latz
Pending: Senate Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees of school contractors unemployment benefit eligibility authorization
Title
Employees of school contractors unemployment benefit eligibility authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2341 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Author added Uglem.