MN SF2131 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 176 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 176 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Design-build contracting program for local transportation projects provisions modifications
Title
Design-build contracting program for local transportation projects provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. John Howe [R] | Sen. Joseph Gimse [R] | Sen. Al DeKruif [R] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] |
Rep. Bruce Vogel [R] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 176 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-20 | Governor's action Approval 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2012-04-05 | House | Bill was passed vote: 121-0 |
2012-04-05 | House | Third reading |
2012-04-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-20 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2378 |
2012-03-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 59-2 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |