MN SF2011 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Worker Safety and Energy Security Act; criminal penalties
Title
Worker Safety and Energy Security Act; criminal penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Authors added Bakk; Tomassoni; Ingebrigtsen |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2241 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Author stricken Ecklund