MN SF2008 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 48 05/12/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 48 05/12/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Price marking requirements for retail merchandise modification
Title
Price marking requirements for retail merchandise modification
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 48 05/12/17 | |
2017-05-15 | Governor's action Approval 05/12/17 | |
2017-05-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-05-12 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Returned from House |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 10, 2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2096 |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2096 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - HF indefinitely postponed