MN SF2003 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1989, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Disclosures requirements and certain conduct prohibitions relating to ticket sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosures requirements and certain conduct prohibitions relating to ticket sales

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1989, SF indefinitely postponed
2024-04-04SenateSecond reading
2024-04-04SenateWithdrawn
2024-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2024-03-04SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
2024-02-12SenateChief author added Klein
2024-02-12SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Port
2024-02-12SenateAuthor stricken Maye Quade
2023-04-14SenateAuthor added Pha
2023-03-07SenateAuthor added Kupec
2023-03-02SenateAuthor added Seeberger
2023-02-27SenateAuthor added Maye Quade
2023-02-21SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
2023-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1989 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 94

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback