MN SF2 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus state government finance and policy bill
Title
Omnibus state government finance and policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House: 64 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 0 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House: 64 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 0 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor approval | |
2021-06-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 12 | |
2021-06-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-06-30 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-06-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Amendment reconsidered |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion for reconsideration Drazkowski amendment to the Winkler amendment |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion for reconsideration of third reading as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Amended |
2021-06-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, June 29, 2021 |
2021-06-28 | House | Second reading |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-06-25 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2021-06-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF12 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Author added Freiberg