MN SF1986 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Commitment to Higher Education Act
Title
Minnesota Commitment to Higher Education Act
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Authors added Kupec; Putnam; Hoffman |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF783 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Author added Coulter