MN SF1950 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal background checks by political subdivisions (local government units) authorization
Title
Criminal background checks by political subdivisions (local government units) authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Local Government |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2066 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Author added Moller