MN SF1949 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Lawful sports betting establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawful sports betting establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenateAuthor added Frentz
2024-03-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2024-03-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2024-02-19SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
2023-05-12SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2023-05-11SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
2023-05-10SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2023-05-10SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2023-03-27SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
2023-03-16SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-03-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
2023-03-01SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
2023-02-21SenateAuthor added Kunesh
2023-02-20SenateReferred to State and Local Government and Veterans
2023-02-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2000 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1949&ssn=0&y=2023
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=0&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=1&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=2&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=3&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=4&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=5&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1949&version=6&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf

Bill Comments

feedback