MN SF1943 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Central Iron Range sanitary sewer board appointment of members of the governing bodies of participating municipalities authorization
Title
Central Iron Range sanitary sewer board appointment of members of the governing bodies of participating municipalities authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2475 |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2475 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed