MN SF1806 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Equal pay certificate as condition for public contracts
Title
Equal pay certificate as condition for public contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |