MN SF1773 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
University of Minnesota employees veterinary medicine licensure modification
Title
University of Minnesota employees veterinary medicine licensure modification
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1817 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger