MN SF1737 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2174
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2174
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local government depository designation establishment and certain investments authorization
Title
Local government depository designation establishment and certain investments authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lillie [R] | Sen. Raymond Vandeveer [R] | Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2174 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Local Government and Elections |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |