MN SF1734 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2136
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2136
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Damaged vehicle salvage title and damage disclosure modifications
Title
Damaged vehicle salvage title and damage disclosure modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Joseph Gimse [R] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kruse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2136 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |