MN SF173 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Senate file first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Election voter registration photo ID requirement; voter identification care creation; provisional ballots establishment; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election voter registration photo ID requirement; voter identification care creation; provisional ballots establishment; appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseSenate file first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections
2021-05-06HouseReceived from Senate
2021-05-03SenateThird reading Passed
2021-05-03SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-02-25SenateSecond reading
2021-02-25SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2021-02-11SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2021-02-08SenateRule 12.10: report of votes in committee
2021-02-08SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2021-02-01SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
2021-01-21SenateAuthors added Kiffmeyer; Gazelka; Johnson; Draheim
2021-01-19SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-01-19SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF293 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Author added Lucero

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback