MN SF172 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-20 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-20 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft titling certificate of title issuance requirements modifications
Title
Watercraft titling certificate of title issuance requirements modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2011-05-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |
2011-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |