MN SF17 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Returned to General Register
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Resolution requesting Congress to propose a constitutional amendment and, if Congress does not propose an amendment, applying to Congress to call a constitutional convention to propose an amendment clarifying the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution requesting Congress to propose a constitutional amendment and, if Congress does not propose an amendment, applying to Congress to call a constitutional convention to propose an amendment clarifying the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseReturned to General Register
2014-05-13HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014
2014-04-28HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 30, 2014
2014-03-04HouseSecond reading
2014-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2013-05-08HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2013
2013-05-06HouseSecond reading
2013-05-06HouseBills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
2013-05-03HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF276
2013-05-03HouseReceived from Senate
2013-05-02SenateThird reading Passed vote: 36-24
2013-05-02SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2013-03-18SenateSecond reading
2013-03-18SenateComm report: To pass
2013-03-04SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Judiciary
2013-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback