MN SF1698 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commerce commissioner weights and measures authority modification; fuels advertisement, definition, and standards provisions modifications
Title
Commerce commissioner weights and measures authority modification; fuels advertisement, definition, and standards provisions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Second reading |
2015-05-08 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-05-07 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1625 |
2015-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Special Order |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1625 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - HF indefinitely postponed