MN SF166 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Kunesh
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Maternal death studies conducted by the commissioner of health expansion to include maternal morbidity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal death studies conducted by the commissioner of health expansion to include maternal morbidity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateAuthor added Kunesh
2023-01-19SenateAuthor added Boldon
2023-01-17SenateAuthor added Maye Quade
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2023-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF53 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Author changed Clardy shown as chief author

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback