MN SF1621 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fireworks manufacture, sale, and use regulation
Title
Fireworks manufacture, sale, and use regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1715 (Similar To) 2019-05-18 - Author added Boe