MN SF1606 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Probation length for certain offenses modification; court granting of early termination and discharge of probation clarification
Title
Probation length for certain offenses modification; court granting of early termination and discharge of probation clarification
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Author stricken Hall |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF689 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Second reading