MN SF1586 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 175 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 175 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vulnerable adult neglect crime felony deprivation penalty creation; unreasonable restraint of a child provision modification
Title
Vulnerable adult neglect crime felony deprivation penalty creation; unreasonable restraint of a child provision modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 175 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-20 | Governor's action Approval 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-05 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 122-0 |
2012-04-05 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-05 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-05 | House | Conference committee report |
2012-04-05 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 58-0 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Third reading vote: 58-0 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2012-03-29 | House | House conferees Gottwalt, Peppin and Hilstrom |
2012-03-29 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate conferees Limmer, Ortman, Ingebrigtsen |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House conferees Gottwalt; Peppin; Hilstrom |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate conferees Limmer; Ortman; Ingebrigtsen |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-03-27 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 128-4 |
2012-03-27 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Amended |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2012-03-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |