MN SF1511 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans suicide prevention and awareness day establishment
Title
Veterans suicide prevention and awareness day establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1526 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Second reading