MN SF1402 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Chief author added Jungbauer
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Chief author added Jungbauer
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parenting time presumption increase in joint custody proceedings
Title
Parenting time presumption increase in joint custody proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Jungbauer [R] | Sen. Pam Wolf [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Gary Kubly [D] |
Sen. David Hann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Senate | Chief author added Jungbauer |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Wolf |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Author stricken Hoffman |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Chief author added Wolf |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Hoffman |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Author added Hann |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Author added Kubly |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Author added Sparks |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |