MN SF1369 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's school-linked mental health grants appropriation
Title
Children's school-linked mental health grants appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF960 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Authors added Franke and Scott.