MN SF134 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public employee definition modification
Title
Public employee definition modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 77 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Veto message laid on table | |
2012-03-12 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 129 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-08 | Governor veto | |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Returned from House |
2012-03-01 | House | Bill was passed vote: 77-55 |
2012-03-01 | House | Third reading |
2012-02-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-16 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-17 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF212 |
2011-05-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 34-30 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Motion did not prevail To strike and re-refer to Rules and Administration vote: 30-33 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |