MN SF13 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus health and human services bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus health and human services bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-17 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 106 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 115
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17HouseBill was passed as amended
2020-05-17HouseThird reading as amended
2020-05-17HouseAmended
2020-05-17HouseSecond reading
2020-05-17HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2020-05-17HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-17HouseMotion to suspend rules
2020-05-17HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-17HouseMotion to recall
2020-05-17SenateThird reading
2020-05-17SenateSenate concurred and repassed bill
2020-05-17SenateReturned from House with amendment
2020-05-17SenateChief author added Benson
2020-05-17SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Draheim
2020-05-17SenateAuthor stricken Anderson, P.
2019-04-05HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-04-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-04SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-03-13SenateSecond reading
2019-03-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-21SenateAuthor added Housley
2019-02-07SenateAuthor added Klein
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2715 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0013&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF13&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF13&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF13&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF13&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=2165
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=7414
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10644
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10645

Bill Comments

feedback