MN SF1295 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education initiatives appropriation for to support students who are or were in foster care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education initiatives appropriation for to support students who are or were in foster care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenateAuthor added Abeler
2023-02-13SenateAuthor added Duckworth
2023-02-06SenateReferred to Higher Education
2023-02-06SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1789 (Similar To) 2023-02-20 - Author added Norris

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback