MN SF1293 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers compensation provisions modifications; workers compensation advisory council recommendations and department of labor and industry (DLI) proposals adoption; forbearance of accounts owed to a special compensation fund authorization; intervention procedures modification; rulemaking authorization
Title
Workers compensation provisions modifications; workers compensation advisory council recommendations and department of labor and industry (DLI) proposals adoption; forbearance of accounts owed to a special compensation fund authorization; intervention procedures modification; rulemaking authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1366 |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Author added Sparks |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1366 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - HF indefinitely postponed