MN SF126 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Authors added Ingebrigtsen; Draheim
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School buses seat belt requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School buses seat belt requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateAuthors added Ingebrigtsen; Draheim
2017-03-14SenateAuthor added Rest
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2017-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF84 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Author added Flanagan.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback