MN SF1245 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF997
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF997
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Claims payment requirements modification
Title
Claims payment requirements modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF997 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF997 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 52 05/12/17