MN SF123 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School lunch and breakfast provision for all students
Title
School lunch and breakfast provision for all students
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Gustafson [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Author stricken Hauschild |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Education Policy |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF5 (Similar To) 2023-03-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 18