MN SF1213 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public employee definition exclusions modifications
Title
Public employee definition exclusions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Special Order: Amended (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Special Order: Amended (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2023-04-03 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1161 |
2023-04-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1161 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - HF indefinitely postponed