MN SF12 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Walleye limit reduction by the natural resources commissioner requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Walleye limit reduction by the natural resources commissioner requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateSecond reading
2021-03-04SenateComm report: To pass
2021-02-15SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-01-07SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2021-01-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF100 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback