MN SF1124 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 54 05/12/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 54 05/12/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus lands bill
Title
Omnibus lands bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 54 05/12/17 | |
2017-05-15 | Governor's action Approval 05/12/17 | |
2017-05-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-05-12 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading vote: 55-0 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 10, 2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2017-04-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1451 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means