MN SF112 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal gang investigative data retention extension
Title
Criminal gang investigative data retention extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF339 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Author added Poston