MN SF1108 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proof of insurance requirement prior to motor vehicle or motorcycle registration, reregistration or ownership transfer
Title
Proof of insurance requirement prior to motor vehicle or motorcycle registration, reregistration or ownership transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Vicki Jensen [D] | Sen. James Metzen [D] |
Sen. David Senjem [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1566 (Similar To) 2015-03-17 - Second reading