MN SF1092 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF861
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF861
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota licensing and registration system (MNLARS) and driver and vehicle services appropriation
Title
Minnesota licensing and registration system (MNLARS) and driver and vehicle services appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF861 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF861 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 1 03/05/2019