MN SF106 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State capitol grounds World War I veterans court of honor plaque placement
Title
State capitol grounds World War I veterans court of honor plaque placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2017-04-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF965 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration