MN SF1048 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Isaacson
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Isaacson
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dismissals of students in kindergarten through grade 3 prohibition
Title
Dismissals of students in kindergarten through grade 3 prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Author added Isaacson |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Author added Murphy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF951 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Author added Youakim