MN SF1017 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic information provisions modifications; dissemination of biological specimens and health data treatment authorization; newborn screening program evaluation requirements
Title
Genetic information provisions modifications; dissemination of biological specimens and health data treatment authorization; newborn screening program evaluation requirements
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-19 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and returned to author |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |