MN SF10 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cooperative purchasing and shared services program for school districts and charter schools requirement
Title
Cooperative purchasing and shared services program for school districts and charter schools requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. Tarryl Clark [D] | Sen. Gen Olson [R] | Sen. Kathy Saltzman [D] |
Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight | |
2009-04-06 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-04-06 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-16 | Senate: General Orders: Amended, progress | |
2009-03-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-12 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-01-08 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Finance |