MN SF1 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/26/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health insurance premium assistance temporary payment program; health maintenance organizations (HMO) requirements and health insurance modifications; agricultural cooperative health plan authorization; tax provision modification; transition of care coverage for 2017; reporting requirements; funds transfer; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance premium assistance temporary payment program; health maintenance organizations (HMO) requirements and health insurance modifications; agricultural cooperative health plan authorization; tax provision modification; transition of care coverage for 2017; reporting requirements; funds transfer; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail (Y: 30 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 73 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 71 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 72 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 98 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Bill passed (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 32 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-30 Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/26/17
2017-01-30 Governor's action Approval 01/26/17
2017-01-30SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2017-01-26 Secretary of State, Filed
2017-01-26 Governor approval
2017-01-26 Presented to Governor
2017-01-26HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 108-19
2017-01-26HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2017-01-26HouseHouse adopted conference committee report - question recurred.
2017-01-26HouseMotion did not prevail vote: 44-83
2017-01-26HouseMotion to return bill to conference committee
2017-01-26HouseMotion to adopt conference committee report
2017-01-26HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2017-01-26HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2017-01-26SenateThird reading vote: 47-19
2017-01-26SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2017-01-26SenateMotion to reject CC report, did not prevail vote: 30-36
2017-01-26SenateConference committee report
2017-01-23SenateHouse conferees Hoppe; Davids; Dean M.; Fabian; Halverson
2017-01-23SenateSenate conferees Benson; Abeler; Dahms; Jensen; Franzen
2017-01-23SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-01-23SenateReturned from House with amendment
2017-01-23HouseHouse conferees Hoppe; Davids; Dean, M; Fabian; Halverson.
2017-01-23HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
2017-01-23HouseSenate conferees Benson, Abeler, Dahms, Jensen, Franzen
2017-01-23HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-01-19HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 73-54
2017-01-19HouseThird reading as amended
2017-01-19HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2017-01-19HouseAmended
2017-01-19HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 19, 2017
2017-01-17HouseSecond reading
2017-01-17HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2017-01-12HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1
2017-01-12HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-12SenateBill passed vote: 35-31
2017-01-12SenateMotion did not prevail To refer to Taxes
2017-01-12SenateThird reading
2017-01-12SenateSpecial Order
2017-01-11SenateSecond reading
2017-01-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2017-01-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2017-01-05SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2017-01-05SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Author added Fabian.

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0001&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=122
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=123
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0001&session_number=0&year=2017&id=12
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0001&session_number=0&year=2017&id=14
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0001&session_number=0&year=2017&id=15
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0001&session_number=0&year=2017&id=16
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0001&session_number=0&year=2017&id=17
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=424
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=423

Bill Comments

feedback