MN SF1 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/27/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/27/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster assistance deficiency funding appropriations
Title
Disaster assistance deficiency funding appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Vicki Jensen [D] | Sen. Kevin Dahle [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] |
Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/27/15 | |
2015-01-29 | Governor's action Approval 01/27/15 | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Returned from House |
2015-01-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-01-27 | Governor approval | |
2015-01-27 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-01-26 | House | Bill was passed vote: 132-0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Third reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Motion prevailed |
2015-01-26 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-01-22 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF164 |
2015-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Author added Sieben |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Author added Weber |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF164 (Similar To) 2015-01-29 - Authors added Hansen, O'Neill, and Fabian.