MN SF1 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Job creation; business tax reductions; department of natural resources (DNR) permitting efficiency; environmental review requirements modifications
Title
Job creation; business tax reductions; department of natural resources (DNR) permitting efficiency; environmental review requirements modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Geoffrey Michel [R] | Sen. Amy Koch [R] | Sen. James Metzen [D] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
Sen. Ted Lillie [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Steve Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2011-07-19 | House | Bill was passed vote: 77-51 |
2011-07-19 | House | Third reading |
2011-07-19 | House | Second reading |
2011-07-19 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2011-07-19 | House | Senate file first reading |
2011-07-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2011-01-31 | Senate | Authors added Gazelka; Lillie |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Author added Metzen |
2011-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth |
2011-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0001&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=SF1&version=0&session=ls87 |