MN SC1 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Returned from House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Returned from House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate concurrent resolution relating to the adoption of temporary joint rules
Title
A Senate concurrent resolution relating to the adoption of temporary joint rules
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-01-21 | House | Resolution was adopted |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported to the House |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-01-07 | House | Resolution introduced, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-01-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduction |