MN HF998 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing veterans for criminal offenses related to a service-related disorder court guidance provided.
Title
Sentencing veterans for criminal offenses related to a service-related disorder court guidance provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-14 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-02-19 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1153 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy