MN HF997 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Offenders sentenced to probation and length of probation guidance provided, and data integration for probation provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offenders sentenced to probation and length of probation guidance provided, and data integration for probation provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-11HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2477 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback