MN HF990 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax return free electronic filing system provided, and appointment of early education and development director established.
Title
Individual income tax return free electronic filing system provided, and appointment of early education and development director established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Peterson. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF413 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Author added Limmer