MN HF99 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Wills.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Wills.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student surveys and similar instruments notice requirements established.
Title
Student surveys and similar instruments notice requirements established.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] |
Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Author added Wills. |
2015-02-09 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2015-01-26 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF979 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Author added Housley